**Question 1. Find the sum by suitable rearrangement:**

(a) 837 + 208 + 363 (b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647

(a) 837 + 208 + 363 (b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647

Answer:

(a) 837+208+363

= (837+363)+208

= 1200+208

= 1408

(b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647

= 1962 + 647+ 453 + 1538

= (1962 +1538) + (647+453)

= (3500)+(1100)

= 4400

**Question 2. Find the product by suitable rearrangement:**

(a) 2 ×1768× 50 (b) 4 × 166 × 25 (c) 8 × 291 × 125

(d) 625 ×279 × 16 (e) 285 × 5 ×60 (f) 125 × 40 × 8 × 25

(a) 2 ×1768× 50 (b) 4 × 166 × 25 (c) 8 × 291 × 125

(d) 625 ×279 × 16 (e) 285 × 5 ×60 (f) 125 × 40 × 8 × 25

Answer:

(a) 2× 1768 ×50

= 2 × 50 ×1768

= 100 ×1768

= 176800

(b) 4 × 166 ×25

= 4 × 25 ×166

= 100 × 166

= 16600

(c) 8 × 291 ×125

= 8 × 125 ×291

= 1000 × 291

= 291000

(d) 625 × 279×16

= 625 ×16 ×279

= 10000 ×279

= 2790000

(e) 285 ×5 ×60

= 285 ×300

= 285×100×3

= 285×3×100

= 855×100

= 85500

(f) 125 ×40 ×8 × 25

= 125 × 8 × 40 × 25

= 1000 ×1000

= 1000000

**Question 3. Find the value of the following:**

(a) 297 × 17 + 297 × 3 (b) 54279 × 92 + 8 × 54279

(c) 81265 × 169 – 81265 ×69 (d) 3845 × 5 × 782 + 769 × 25 ×218

(a) 297 × 17 + 297 × 3 (b) 54279 × 92 + 8 × 54279

(c) 81265 × 169 – 81265 ×69 (d) 3845 × 5 × 782 + 769 × 25 ×218

Answer:

(a) 297 ×17 + 297 ×3

= 297 × ( 17 +3 )

= 297×(20)

= 297×10×2

= 2970×2

= 5940

(b) 54279 × 92 + 8 × 54279

= 54279 × (92+8)

= 54279 × (100)

= 54279 ×100

= 5427900

(c) 81265 × 169 – 81265 ×69

= 81265 ×( 169 – 69)

= 81265 ×(100)

=81265 ×100

=8126500

(d) 3845 × 5 × 782 + 769 × 25 ×218

= 769 ×5×5 × 782 + 769 × 25 ×218

= 769 ×(5×5 ×782+25 ×218)

= 769 ×(25× 782+25 ×218)

= 769 ×25(782+218)

= 769 ×25(1000)

= 769 ×25 ×1000

= 19225000

**Question 4. Find the product using suitable properties.**

(a) 738 ×103 (b) 854 × 102 (c) 258 × 1008 (d) 1005 × 168

(a) 738 ×103 (b) 854 × 102 (c) 258 × 1008 (d) 1005 × 168

Answer:

(a) 738 ×103

= 738×(100+3)

= 738×100 + 738×3

= 73800 + 2214

= 76014

(b) 854 × 102

= 854 ×(100+2)

= 854×100 + 854×2

= 85400 + 1708

= 87108

(c) 258 × 1008

= 258×(1000+8)

= 258×1000 + 258×8

= 258000 + 2064

= 260064

(d) 1005 × 168

= (1000+5)×168

= 1000 ×168+168×5

= 168000 + 840

= 168840

**Question 5. A taxi driver filled his car petrol tank with 40 litres of petrol on Monday.**

The next day,he filled the tank with 50 litres of petrol. If the petrol costs

Rs 44 per litre, how much did he spend in all on petrol?

The next day,he filled the tank with 50 litres of petrol. If the petrol costs

Rs 44 per litre, how much did he spend in all on petrol?

Answer:

A taxidriver filled his car petrol tank on Monday | = 40 litres |

A taxi driver filled his car petrol tank on next day | = 50 litres |

The totle litres of petrol he filled his car petrol tank | = 40 + 50 = 90 litres |

The price of one liter of petrol | =Rs 44 |

There for the price of 90 lirtes of petrol | =Rs 90 × 44=Rs 3960 |

**Question 6. A vendor supplies 32 litres of milk to a hotel in the morning and 68litres of milk in the evening. If the milk**

costs

Rs 15 per litre, howmuch money is due to the vendor per day?

costs

Rs 15 per litre, howmuch money is due to the vendor per day?

**Question 7. Match the following:**

(i) 425 ×136 = 425 × (6 + 30 +100) | (a)Commutativity under multiplication. |

(ii) 2 × 49 × 50 = 2 × 50 × 49 | (b) Commutativity under addition. |

(iii) 80 + 2005 + 20 = 80 + 20 + 2005 | (c) Distributivity of multiplication over addition. |

(i) 425 ×136 = 425 × (6 + 30 +100) | (c) Distributivity of multiplication over addition. |

(ii) 2 × 49 × 50 = 2 × 50 × 49 | (a) Commutativity under multiplication. |

(iii) 80 + 2005 + 20 = 80 + 20 + 2005 | (b) Commutativity under addition. |

very helpful for parents thank you

ReplyDeleteYes very helpful thank you

DeleteHi...

DeleteI have some problems in maths can you please help me

Deletethe sum by suitable rearrangement: - 248 + 165 + 352 + 135

Deletevery helpful

ReplyDeleteThanks for the help

ReplyDeleteYashita Thakur

The correct answer for question 1 part b is 4600

ReplyDelete(b) 1962 + 453 + 1538 + 647

ReplyDelete= 1962 + 647+ 453 + 1538

= (1962 +1538) + (647+453)

= (3500)+(1100)

= 4400 - pls make it 4600

I like it thanks for this because I can understand this sum and now I understand it breafle.

ReplyDeleteThanks

Thank it help me exam

ReplyDeleteCan you give me the and of this sum 81265×169-81265×69

ReplyDeleteVery helpful

ReplyDeleteHelpful thanks a lot

ReplyDeleteVery good example

ReplyDeleteVery very helpful to parents thank you so much

ReplyDelete3845×5×782+3845×5×218 sir i am not understand solve this problem.

ReplyDelete3845 × 5 × ( 782 + 218)

Delete19225 × 1000

= 19225000

Very useful

ReplyDelete493×99 find the suitable properties

ReplyDelete4x65x25 in suitable rearrangement

ReplyDeletewhere is answer of the question number 6???

ReplyDeleteFind the sum by suitable rearrangement:I

ReplyDeleteIn b part your answer is 4400 and my class teacher gave the answer is 4600.

Very nice it helped me a lot

ReplyDeletecan u pls tell the anwser of Determine the given product by suitable rearrangement

ReplyDelete155 x 102