Question 1. Which of the following will not represent zero:
Answer:
Question 2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will
be zero? Justify through examples.
Answer:Yes
Question 3. If the product of two whole numbers is 1, can we say that one or both of them will be
1? Justify through examples.
Answer:
Question 4. Find using distributive property :
(a) 728 × 101 (b) 5437 × 1001 (c) 824 × 25 (d) 4275 × 125 (e) 504 × 35
Question 5. Study the pattern :
Write the next two steps. Can you say how the pattern works?
(Hint: 12345 = 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1).
Answer:
(a)  a + 0 
(b)  0 × 0 
(c)  0 
2 
(d)  10×10 
2 
Answer:
(a)  a + 0  and  (d)  10×10 
2 
Question 2. If the product of two whole numbers is zero, can we say that one or both of them will
be zero? Justify through examples.
Answer:Yes
1.  5 × 0 = 0  Here second number is a Zero, and its product with 1 is also Zero 
2.  0 × 12 = 0  Here first number is a Zero and its product with 12 is also Zero 
3.  0 × 0 = 0  Here both numbers are a Zeros and their product is also Zero 
Hence If the product of two whole numbers is zero, we can say that one or both of them will be zero 
1? Justify through examples.
Answer:
1.  15 × 1 = 15  Here second number is 1 and its product with 15 is 15 
2.  1 × 23 = 23  Here first number is 1 and its product with 23 is 23 
3.  1 × 1 = 1  Here both numbers are 1s and their product is 1 
Hence If the product of two whole numbers is 1,we can say that one or both of them will be 1 
Question 4. Find using distributive property :
(a) 728 × 101 (b) 5437 × 1001 (c) 824 × 25 (d) 4275 × 125 (e) 504 × 35
(a)  728 × 101  = 728×( 100 + 1 ) 
= 728 × 100 + 728 × 1  
= 72800 + 728  
= 72800 + 700 +28  
= 73528 
(b)  5437 × 1001  = 5437×( 1000 + 1 ) 
= 5437 × 1000 + 5437 × 1  
= 5437000 + 5437  
= 5437000 + 5000 + 400 + 37  
= 5442000 + 400 + 37  
= 5442400 + 37  
= 54312437 
(c)  824 × 25  = 824 × (20 + 5) 
= 824 × 20 + 824 × 5  
= 824×10×2+4120  
= 8240×2 + 4120  
= 16480+4120  
= 16000+480+4000+120  
= 20000+480+120  
= 20600 
(d)  4275 × 125  = 4275 × (100 + 25) 
= 4275 × 100 + 4275 × 25  
= 427500 + 4275 ×(20+5)  
= 427500 + 4275×20+4275×5  
= 427500 + 4275×10×2+21375  
= 427500 + 42750×2+21375  
= 427500 + 85550 + 21375  
= 427000 + 500 + 85000 + 550 + 21000 + 375  
= 560000 + 500 + 550 + 375  
= 560000 + 1425  
= 561425 
(e)  4504 × 35  = (500+4) × 35 
= 500×35+4×35  
= 500×(30+5)+4×(30+5)  
= 500×30+500×5+4×30+4×5  
= 15000+25000+120+20  
= 40140 
Question 5. Study the pattern :
(i)  1 × 8 + 1 = 9 
(ii)  12 × 8 + 2 = 98 
(iii)  123 × 8 + 3 = 987 
(iv)  1234 × 8 + 4 = 9876 
(v)  12345 × 8 + 5 = 98765 
(Hint: 12345 = 11111 + 1111 + 111 + 11 + 1).
Answer:
(i)  1 × 8 + 1 = 9 
(ii)  12 × 8 + 2 = 98 
(iii)  123 × 8 + 3 = 987 
(iv)  1234 × 8 + 4 = 9876 
(v)  12345 × 8 + 5 = 98765 
(v)  123456 × 8 + 6 = 987654 
(v)  1234567 × 8 + 7 = 9876543 
How the Pattern works ?:  

No comments:
Post a Comment